NY S01227 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-14 - SIGNED CHAP.422
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-14 - SIGNED CHAP.422
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the licensing of custom beermakers, custom cidermakers and custom winemakers; defines terms; sets fees.
Title
Relates to the licensing of custom beermakers, custom cidermakers and custom winemakers; defines terms; sets fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-14 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.422 |
2016-11-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.327 |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | substituted for a1100b |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2016-06-07 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 1227B |
2016-06-07 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2016-06-07 | Senate | returned to senate |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2016-05-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-04-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.574 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-01-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1227A |
2016-01-25 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2015-05-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-05-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-04-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-04-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.400 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2015-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A01100 (Same As) 2016-06-15 - substituted by s1227b