NY S01138 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-15 - SIGNED CHAP.425
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-15 - SIGNED CHAP.425
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the use of foreign fire insurance premium taxes by the Volunteer and Exempt Firemen's Benevolent Association of Lewiston Fire Company No. 1.
Title
Expands the use of foreign fire insurance premium taxes by the Volunteer and Exempt Firemen's Benevolent Association of Lewiston Fire Company No. 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-15 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.425 |
2023-09-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.213 |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | substituted for a2216 |
2023-05-09 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2023-05-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-02-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-02-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.300 |
2023-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A02216 (Same As) 2023-05-24 - substituted by s1138