NY A02216 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-24 - substituted by s1138
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Expands the use of foreign fire insurance premium taxes by the Volunteer and Exempt Firemen's Benevolent Association of Lewiston Fire Company No. 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expands the use of foreign fire insurance premium taxes by the Volunteer and Exempt Firemen's Benevolent Association of Lewiston Fire Company No. 1.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-24Assemblysubstituted by s1138
2023-05-24Assemblyrules report cal.213
2023-05-24Assemblyreported
2023-05-23Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-05-16Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2023-01-25Assemblyreferred to local governments

Same As/Similar To

S01138 (Same As) 2023-09-15 - SIGNED CHAP.425

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback