NY S01132 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the general aviation task force to study measures that may be implemented to improve general aviation operations in the state of New York.
Title
Establishes the general aviation task force to study measures that may be implemented to improve general aviation operations in the state of New York.
Sponsors
Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2021-04-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-04-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-04-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-04-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.705 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1132A |
2021-03-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2021-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03746 (Same As) 2022-03-03 - print number 3746a