NY S01132 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-19 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-19 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs that every bill passed by both the senate and assembly must be presented to the governor within thirty days of receipt by house of origin; provided if the bill is returned to the house of origin after May first, then it must be presented to the governor within forty-five days.
Title
Directs that every bill passed by both the senate and assembly must be presented to the governor within thirty days of receipt by house of origin; provided if the bill is returned to the house of origin after May first, then it must be presented to the governor within forty-five days.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-19 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2014-01-13 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2013-02-06 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2013-01-11 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |