NY S01103 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - signed chap.5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - signed chap.5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to primary elections and amends certain deadlines to facilitate the timely transmission of ballots to military voters stationed overseas; relates to filling vacancies in elective offices; relates to the date of primary elections.
Title
Relates to primary elections and amends certain deadlines to facilitate the timely transmission of ballots to military voters stationed overseas; relates to filling vacancies in elective offices; relates to the date of primary elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | Senate | signed chap.5 |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.9 |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1103 |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-01-14 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-01-14 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-01-14 | Senate | ruling of chair on point of order |
2019-01-14 | Senate | motion to amend lost |
2019-01-14 | Senate | motion to amend lost |
2019-01-14 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.8 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | rules report cal.8 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | reported |
2019-01-14 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-01-14 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-10 | Senate | referred to election law |
2019-01-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A779 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.9 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A00779 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - signed chap.5