NY A00779 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-2)
Status: Passed on January 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - signed chap.5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to primary elections and amends certain deadlines to facilitate the timely transmission of ballots to military voters stationed overseas; relates to filling vacancies in elective offices; relates to the date of primary elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to primary elections and amends certain deadlines to facilitate the timely transmission of ballots to military voters stationed overseas; relates to filling vacancies in elective offices; relates to the date of primary elections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-24Senatesigned chap.5
2019-01-14Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-01-14SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-01-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-01-14Senate3RD READING CAL.9
2019-01-14SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S1103
2019-01-14SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-01-14Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-01-14Assemblypassed assembly
2019-01-14Assemblyruling of chair on point of order
2019-01-14Assemblymotion to amend lost
2019-01-14Assemblymotion to amend lost
2019-01-14Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.8
2019-01-14Assemblyrules report cal.8
2019-01-14Assemblyreported
2019-01-14Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-01-14Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-01-10Assemblyreferred to election law

Same As/Similar To

S01103 (Same As) 2019-01-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A779

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00779&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00779&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00779
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00779&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00779&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00779&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A779#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00779&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A779#SF2

Bill Comments

feedback