NY S01080 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing requirements for residential health care facilities during a state disaster emergency involving a disease outbreak; requires the department of health to issue guidance regarding precautions and procedures to maintain health and safety; establishes residential healthcare facility reporting requirements.
Title
Relates to establishing requirements for residential health care facilities during a state disaster emergency involving a disease outbreak; requires the department of health to issue guidance regarding precautions and procedures to maintain health and safety; establishes residential healthcare facility reporting requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2021-05-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-03-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1080A |
2021-03-19 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A03131 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - ordered to third reading cal.114