NY A03131 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-12)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to establishing requirements for residential health care facilities during a state disaster emergency involving a disease outbreak; requires the department of health to issue guidance regarding precautions and procedures to maintain health and safety; establishes residential healthcare facility reporting requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to establishing requirements for residential health care facilities during a state disaster emergency involving a disease outbreak; requires the department of health to issue guidance regarding precautions and procedures to maintain health and safety; establishes residential healthcare facility reporting requirements.

Sponsors

Asm. Ron Kim [D]Asm. Phillip Steck [D]Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D]Asm. Harvey Epstein [D]
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D]Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte Hermelyn [D]Asm. Deborah Glick [D]
Asm. Fred Thiele [D]Asm. Judy Griffin [D]Asm. Michael Montesano [R]Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D]
Asm. Inez Dickens [D]Asm. Karen McMahon [D]Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]Asm. Steve Stern [D]
Asm. Charles Barron [D]Asm. Nily Rozic [D]Asm. Marjorie Byrnes [R]Asm. Richard Gottfried [D]
Asm. Brian Barnwell [D]Asm. Michaelle Solages [D]Asm. Michael Norris [R]Asm. David McDonough [R]
Asm. Stefani Zinerman [D]Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D]Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D]Asm. Marcela Mitaynes [D]
Asm. Donna Lupardo [D]Asm. Chantel Jackson [D]Asm. Joseph DeStefano [R]Asm. Michael Lawler [R]
Asm. Stephen Hawley [R]Asm. John Salka [R]Asm. Kevin Byrne [R]Asm. Khaleel Anderson [D]
Asm. Christopher Tague [R]Asm. Matthew Simpson [R]Asm. Anna Kelles [D]Asm. Monica Wallace [D]
Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D]Asm. Phara Souffrant Forrest [D]Asm. Kenneth Blankenbush [R]Asm. Helene Weinstein [D]
Asm. Kenneth Burgos [D]Asm. Alfred Taylor [D]Asm. Nathalia Fernandez [D]Asm. Robert Carroll [D]
Asm. Latrice Walker [D]Asm. Catalina Cruz [D]Asm. Sandra Galef [D]Asm. Jennifer Lunsford [D]
Asm. Sarah Clark [D]Asm. Albert Stirpe [D]Asm. Steven Otis [D]Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D]
Asm. William Colton [D]Asm. Nick Perry [D]Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D]Asm. Jo Simon [D]
Asm. Charles Fall [D]Asm. Gina Sillitti [D]

Roll Calls

2021-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-09SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2021-03-09Assemblydelivered to senate
2021-03-09Assemblypassed assembly
2021-03-09Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.36
2021-03-09Assemblyrules report cal.36
2021-03-09Assemblyreported
2021-03-09Assemblyreported referred to rules
2021-03-09Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2021-03-03Assemblyprint number 3131a
2021-03-03Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to health
2021-01-22Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S01080 (Same As) 2021-05-11 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A3131
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03131&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03131
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03131&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03131A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03131&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03131&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03131&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03131&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments 750

feedback