NY S01066 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-13 - PRINT NUMBER 1066B
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-13 - PRINT NUMBER 1066B
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to energy conservation and water temperature management; requires a study to be performed on the monetary and energy savings that can be accomplished through better water temperature management.
Title
Relates to energy conservation and water temperature management; requires a study to be performed on the monetary and energy savings that can be accomplished through better water temperature management.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1066B |
2016-01-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2015-02-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1066A |
2015-02-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2015-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05797 (Same As) 2016-04-25 - print number 5797a