NY S01040 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: No history available
Pending: Senate Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: No history available
Pending: Senate Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the small business survival act; creates a small business lease program for fair negotiations in the commercial lease renewal process.
Title
Enacts the small business survival act; creates a small business lease program for fair negotiations in the commercial lease renewal process.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1040A |
2016-04-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2015-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A08340 (Same As) 2016-04-18 - print number 8340a