NY S01018 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the court to advise a defendant that if he or she is an alien and he or she is convicted of a crime, whether by plea or trial, such conviction may result in his or her deportation; allows a withdrawal of a plea of guilty by an alien if such alien is threatened with deportation and such alien is not so advised of such threat of deportation.
Title
Requires the court to advise a defendant that if he or she is an alien and he or she is convicted of a crime, whether by plea or trial, such conviction may result in his or her deportation; allows a withdrawal of a plea of guilty by an alien if such alien is threatened with deportation and such alien is not so advised of such threat of deportation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-02-21 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A09441 (Same As) 2012-03-01 - referred to codes