NY S00949 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Excuses prospective jurors who are over the age of 75 or have a health condition putting such person at greater risk for severe illness from COVID-19 from service.
Title
Excuses prospective jurors who are over the age of 75 or have a health condition putting such person at greater risk for severe illness from COVID-19 from service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-01-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-01-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.320 |
2022-01-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 949A |
2022-01-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-02-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.207 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A01879 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - print number 1879a