NY A01879 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - print number 1879a
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - print number 1879a
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Excuses prospective jurors who are over the age of 75 or have a health condition putting such person at greater risk for severe illness from COVID-19 from service.
Title
Excuses prospective jurors who are over the age of 75 or have a health condition putting such person at greater risk for severe illness from COVID-19 from service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Assembly | print number 1879a |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S00949 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES