NY S00922 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5735C
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5735C
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "schools impacted by gross highways (SIGH) act"; prohibits the commissioner of education from approving the plans for the erection of any new schoolhouse within five hundred feet of a controlled-access highway unless the commissioner of education determines that space limitations are so severe that there is no other site to erect such new schoolhouse.
Title
Enacts the "schools impacted by gross highways (SIGH) act"; prohibits the commissioner of education from approving the plans for the erection of any new schoolhouse within five hundred feet of a controlled-access highway unless the commissioner of education determines that space limitations are so severe that there is no other site to erect such new schoolhouse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5735C |
2022-06-02 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1862 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 922C |
2022-05-31 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2022-05-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 922B |
2022-05-20 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2022-02-01 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2021-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1703 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-06-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 922A |
2021-06-04 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05735 (Same As) 2022-12-23 - tabled