NY S00861 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1941
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allows for medical and psychiatric records of deceased inmates to be accessed by the board of correction of the city of New York under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows for medical and psychiatric records of deceased inmates to be accessed by the board of correction of the city of New York under certain circumstances.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-09SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A1941
2021-01-11SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.14
2021-01-06SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A01941 (Same As) 2021-02-16 - signed chap.36

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback