NY A01941 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - signed chap.36
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allows for medical and psychiatric records of deceased inmates to be accessed by the board of correction of the city of New York under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows for medical and psychiatric records of deceased inmates to be accessed by the board of correction of the city of New York under certain circumstances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-16Senatesigned chap.36
2021-02-12Assemblydelivered to governor
2021-02-09SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-02-09SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-02-09Senate3RD READING CAL.14
2021-02-09SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S861
2021-02-01SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2021-02-01Assemblydelivered to senate
2021-02-01Assemblypassed assembly
2021-01-21Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.54
2021-01-20Assemblyreported
2021-01-13Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S00861 (Same As) 2021-02-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1941

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback