NY S00826 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A616
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A616
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the effectiveness of certain curriculum requirements related to human trafficking awareness to be included in alcohol training awareness programs.
Title
Relates to the effectiveness of certain curriculum requirements related to human trafficking awareness to be included in alcohol training awareness programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A616 |
2023-01-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.35 |
2023-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A00616 (Same As) 2023-03-03 - signed chap.12