NY S00693 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department to review laws and policies pertaining to free or reduced cost hunting and fishing licenses.
Title
Requires the department to review laws and policies pertaining to free or reduced cost hunting and fishing licenses.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-04-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-04-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.777 |
2018-01-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.854 |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04844 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to ways and means