NY S00688 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires local boards and the division of housing and community renewal to submit certain residential housing and zoning information to the department of state annually; requires such information to be published by the department of state on its website.
Title
Requires local boards and the division of housing and community renewal to submit certain residential housing and zoning information to the department of state annually; requires such information to be published by the department of state on its website.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-02-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.474 |
2024-01-29 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2023-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1619 |
2023-06-06 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-09 | Senate | REFERENCE CHANGED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2023-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A04990 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to governmental operations