NY S00680 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the definition of "abused child".
Title
Relates to the definition of "abused child".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.125 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-02-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-02-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.186 |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A04558 (Same As) 2017-12-15 - enacting clause stricken