NY S00618 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - PRINT NUMBER 618C
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - PRINT NUMBER 618C
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires manufacturers of digital electronic parts to offer for sale documentation, diagnostic and repair information in the same manner as such manufacturer provides such diagnostic and repair information to such manufacturer's repair provider; section does not apply to motor vehicles.
Title
Requires manufacturers of digital electronic parts to offer for sale documentation, diagnostic and repair information in the same manner as such manufacturer provides such diagnostic and repair information to such manufacturer's repair provider; section does not apply to motor vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 618C |
2018-01-31 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2017-06-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 618B |
2017-06-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2017-04-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 618A |
2017-04-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A08192 (Same As) 2018-01-29 - print number 8192a