NY A08192 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-5)
Status: Introduced on June 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - print number 8192a
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - print number 8192a
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires manufacturers of digital electronic parts to offer for sale documentation, diagnostic and repair information in the same manner as such manufacturer provides such diagnostic and repair information to such manufacturer's repair provider; section does not apply to motor vehicles.
Title
Requires manufacturers of digital electronic parts to offer for sale documentation, diagnostic and repair information in the same manner as such manufacturer provides such diagnostic and repair information to such manufacturer's repair provider; section does not apply to motor vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-29 | Assembly | print number 8192a |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S00618 (Same As) 2018-01-31 - PRINT NUMBER 618C