NY S00590 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-20 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO CITIES
Pending: Senate Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-20 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO CITIES
Pending: Senate Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes the photo speed violation monitoring systems program for school speed zones in the city of New York permanent; reduces the limitations on the number of schools at which such systems may be utilized and the times during which they may be operated; requires such city to install signs giving notice of the use of such a system; removes the jurisdiction of the New York city parking violations bureau over school zone speed violations.
Title
Makes the photo speed violation monitoring systems program for school speed zones in the city of New York permanent; reduces the limitations on the number of schools at which such systems may be utilized and the times during which they may be operated; requires such city to install signs giving notice of the use of such a system; removes the jurisdiction of the New York city parking violations bureau over school zone speed violations.
Sponsors
Sen. Jose Peralta [D] | Sen. Marisol Alcantara [D] | Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. Jesse Hamilton [D] |
Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Jeffrey Klein [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO CITIES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2017-02-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 590A |
2017-02-24 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06677 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to transportation