NY S00518 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires a resolution by the board of trustees of a school district to authorize the installation, administration, operation, notice processing and maintenance of and use of photo monitoring devices on school buses to detect and record vehicles illegally passing or overtaking a school bus; provides for owner liability of a motor vehicle detected by a camera to have illegally passed or overtaken a school bus; provides that liability shall be a monetary penalty in the amount of two hundred fifty dollars.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires a resolution by the board of trustees of a school district to authorize the installation, administration, operation, notice processing and maintenance of and use of photo monitoring devices on school buses to detect and record vehicles illegally passing or overtaking a school bus; provides for owner liability of a motor vehicle detected by a camera to have illegally passed or overtaken a school bus; provides that liability shall be a monetary penalty in the amount of two hundred fifty dollars.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-19Assemblyreferred to codes
2018-06-19SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-05-22SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 518B
2018-03-13SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-03-12Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-03-06Senate1ST REPORT CAL.603
2018-02-08SenatePRINT NUMBER 518A
2018-02-08SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
2017-01-04SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A00321 (Same As) 2018-06-05 - reported referred to codes

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback