NY S00473 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a surrogate court clerk or chief clerk shall refuse to accept for filing papers filed in a proceeding only under certain circumstances or as designated in statute, administrative rule or order of the court; provides such reasons; requires the payment of any applicable statutory fees, or an order of the court waiving payment of such fees, before accepting a paper for filing; makes related provisions.
Title
Provides that a surrogate court clerk or chief clerk shall refuse to accept for filing papers filed in a proceeding only under certain circumstances or as designated in statute, administrative rule or order of the court; provides such reasons; requires the payment of any applicable statutory fees, or an order of the court waiving payment of such fees, before accepting a paper for filing; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-02-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-01-31 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.288 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-01-25 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2023-01-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-01-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-01-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-01-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.134 |
2023-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A03202 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to judiciary