NY S00355 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - VETOED MEMO.64
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - VETOED MEMO.64
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the use of drilling fluids, brine and flowback water from wells, pools or fields on any highway for any purpose including but not limited to de-icing or dust suppression.
Title
Prohibits the use of drilling fluids, brine and flowback water from wells, pools or fields on any highway for any purpose including but not limited to de-icing or dust suppression.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 121 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-22 | Senate | VETOED MEMO.64 |
2021-12-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.161 |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | substituted for a903 |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-03-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.237 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00903 (Same As) 2021-04-20 - substituted by s355