NY S00333 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-20 - referred to housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-20 - referred to housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the inspection of non-fireproof buildings every three years; requires compliance with the New York city housing maintenance code and the New York city construction codes; requires those dwellings not in compliance with such code at the time of inspection to make repairs or improvements necessary to comply with such standards within six months of such inspection, or a lien shall be placed upon the dwelling.
Title
Requires the inspection of non-fireproof buildings every three years; requires compliance with the New York city housing maintenance code and the New York city construction codes; requires those dwellings not in compliance with such code at the time of inspection to make repairs or improvements necessary to comply with such standards within six months of such inspection, or a lien shall be placed upon the dwelling.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-20 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2024-05-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1015 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2023-05-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-02-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-02-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.225 |
2023-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A05415 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to housing