NY S00216 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-09 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-09 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that regents of the University of the state of New York in office March 31, 2016 shall hold office until June 30th of the year in which such term expires; also provides that commencing July 1, 2016 each regent shall be elected to a term of five years with each such term to expire on the last day of June and the election by the legislature to be held on or before the first Tuesday of May; also provides that if the legislature fails to agree on the election by the first Tuesday in May, then the legislature shall meet in joint session at noon on the third Tuesday in May to elect such regent by ballot; further provides that such election shall be held on the second Tuesday in May if the temporary president of the senate and the speaker of the assembly certify no later than March first that such election would conflict with religious observances.
Title
Provides that regents of the University of the state of New York in office March 31, 2016 shall hold office until June 30th of the year in which such term expires; also provides that commencing July 1, 2016 each regent shall be elected to a term of five years with each such term to expire on the last day of June and the election by the legislature to be held on or before the first Tuesday of May; also provides that if the legislature fails to agree on the election by the first Tuesday in May, then the legislature shall meet in joint session at noon on the third Tuesday in May to elect such regent by ballot; further provides that such election shall be held on the second Tuesday in May if the temporary president of the senate and the speaker of the assembly certify no later than March first that such election would conflict with religious observances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-09 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2016-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1476 |
2016-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-02-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 216A |
2016-02-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2015-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |