NY S00167 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Abolishes citizens arrests in New York state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abolishes citizens arrests in New York state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-28Assemblyreferred to codes
2024-03-28SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-03-28SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-02-07SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-02-06Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-02-05Senate1ST REPORT CAL.347
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO CODES
2024-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2023-05-30Assemblyreferred to codes
2023-05-30SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-05-30SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-05-17SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-05-16Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-05-15Senate1ST REPORT CAL.865
2023-01-04SenateREFERRED TO CODES

Same As/Similar To

A00507 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.20

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback