NY A00507 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.20
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.20
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Abolishes citizens arrests in New York state.
Title
Abolishes citizens arrests in New York state.
Sponsors
Asm. Pamela Hunter [D] | Asm. Zohran Kwame Mamdani [D] | Asm. Harvey Epstein [D] | Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D] |
Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Anna Kelles [D] | Asm. Phillip Steck [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.20 |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.124 |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | reported |
2023-01-09 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S00167 (Same As) 2024-03-28 - referred to codes