NY S00122 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Passed on August 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-04 - SIGNED CHAP.196
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Passed on August 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-04 - SIGNED CHAP.196
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Elevates an intentional assault upon a school crossing guard to the class D felony of assault in the second degree.
Title
Elevates an intentional assault upon a school crossing guard to the class D felony of assault in the second degree.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 103 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-04 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.196 |
2014-07-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.538 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a3757b |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2014-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1499 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-06-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 122B |
2014-06-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2014-04-23 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-10 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2014-01-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 122A |
2014-01-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A03757 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - substituted by s122b