NY S00098 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-16 - SIGNED CHAP.240
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-16 - SIGNED CHAP.240
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the research animal retirement act; requires research dogs and cats at higher education research facilities or facilities that provide research in collaboration with a higher education facility, to be offered for placement with non-profit animal rescue and shelter organizations; provides that such facilities may enter into agreements with rescue and shelter organizations for implementation.
Title
Establishes the research animal retirement act; requires research dogs and cats at higher education research facilities or facilities that provide research in collaboration with a higher education facility, to be offered for placement with non-profit animal rescue and shelter organizations; provides that such facilities may enter into agreements with rescue and shelter organizations for implementation.
Sponsors
Sen. Philip Boyle [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
Sen. Terrence Murphy [R] | Sen. Joseph Robach [R] | Sen. Diane Savino [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-16 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.240 |
2016-08-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.229 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | substituted for a8261a |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-01 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 98A |
2016-05-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.919 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2015-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-04-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-04-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.409 |
2015-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03622 (Same As) 2015-06-16 - enacting clause stricken
A08261 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - substituted by s98a
A08261 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - substituted by s98a