NY S00015 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to parole eligibility for certain incarcerated persons age fifty-five or older.
Title
Relates to parole eligibility for certain incarcerated persons age fifty-five or older.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2021-04-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 15A |
2021-04-02 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A03475 (Same As) 2021-04-26 - print number 3475a
A08855 (Same As) 2022-01-19 - referred to correction
A08855 (Same As) 2022-01-19 - referred to correction