NY A10851 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-13 - signed chap.363
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-13 - signed chap.363
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends for two additional years, the ability of referees to determine applications for orders of protection when family court is in session at any time the court is in session during or after established business hours.
Title
Grants the chief administrator of the courts the authority to allow referees to determine applications to a family court for an order of protection when such application is made ex parte or without the presence of all the parties except the applicant; specifies that such provisions shall only apply during those hours that the family court is in session and after 5:00 p.m.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 25 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 25 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-13 | signed chap.363 | |
2010-08-03 | delivered to governor | |
2010-06-16 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-16 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-14 | 3RD READING CAL.816 | |
2010-06-14 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8013 | |
2010-05-26 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY | |
2010-05-26 | delivered to senate | |
2010-05-26 | passed assembly | |
2010-05-17 | amended on third reading 10851a | |
2010-05-13 | advanced to third reading cal.875 | |
2010-05-11 | reported | |
2010-05-04 | reported referred to codes | |
2010-04-26 | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S08013 (Same As) 2010-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10851A