NY A10829 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.277
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.277
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Bais Malka HASC LLC to file an application for certain real property tax exemptions for the 2013 and 2014 taxable years.
Title
Authorizes Bais Malka HASC LLC to file an application for certain real property tax exemptions for the 2013 and 2014 taxable years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-11 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.277 |
2020-10-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-23 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-07-23 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-23 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.346 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | substituted for a10829 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.988 |
2020-03-23 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | substituted by s8127 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.346 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.346 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S08127 (Same As) 2020-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.277