NY A10706 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 67-18)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-17 - substituted by s8114
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-17 - substituted by s8114
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires state reimbursement to counties and cities in which a county is located of the full amount of expenditures for indigent legal services.
Title
Requires state reimbursement to counties and cities in which a county is located of the full amount of expenditures for indigent legal services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s8114 |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.535 |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-06-13 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S08114 (Same As) 2016-12-31 - VETOED MEMO.306