NY A10695 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8293
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8293
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing accidental disability retirement benefits for chief fire marshals, assistant chief fire marshals, division supervising fire marshals, supervising marshals, fire marshals and fire marshal trainees in Nassau county.
Title
Relates to providing accidental disability retirement benefits for chief fire marshals, assistant chief fire marshals, division supervising fire marshals, supervising marshals, fire marshals and fire marshal trainees in Nassau county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s8293 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.417 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.417 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S08293 (Same As) 2018-12-28 - VETOED MEMO.371