NY A10680 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8657
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8657
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Yaphank Presbyterian Church to file an application for exemption for real property taxation.
Title
Authorizes Yaphank Presbyterian Church to file an application for exemption for real property taxation.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Murray [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s8657 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.370 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.370 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S08657 (Same As) 2018-07-31 - SIGNED CHAP.184