NY A10674 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.169
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.169
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends, from December 31, 2018 to December 31, 2023, the expiration of the provisions of the public authorities law authorizing the dormitory authority to construct and finance facilities for the not-for-profit members of the New York State Rehabilitation Association and the New York Alliance for Inclusion and Innovation.
Title
Extends, from December 31, 2018 to December 31, 2023, the expiration of the provisions of the public authorities law authorizing the dormitory authority to construct and finance facilities for the not-for-profit members of the New York State Rehabilitation Association and the New York Alliance for Inclusion and Innovation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | Senate | signed chap.169 |
2018-07-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1972 |
2018-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8815 |
2018-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.66 |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.66 |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S08815 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10674