NY S08815 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10674
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10674
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends, from December 31, 2018 to December 31, 2023, the expiration of the provisions of the public authorities law authorizing the dormitory authority to construct and finance facilities for the not-for-profit members of the New York State Rehabilitation Association and the New York Alliance for Inclusion and Innovation.
Title
Extends, from December 31, 2018 to December 31, 2023, the expiration of the provisions of the public authorities law authorizing the dormitory authority to construct and finance facilities for the not-for-profit members of the New York State Rehabilitation Association and the New York Alliance for Inclusion and Innovation.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10674 |
2018-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1972 |
2018-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-05-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10674 (Same As) 2018-07-31 - signed chap.169