NY A10639 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to warrants and orders of protection in persons in need of supervision cases in family court.
Title
Relates to warrants and orders of protection in persons in need of supervision cases in family court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.402 |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.402 |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2012-06-12 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S07586 (Same As) 2012-06-05 - REFERRED TO RULES