NY A10587 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8431
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8431
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing the Broome county correctional facility to also be used for the detention of persons under arrest being held for arraignment in any court located in the county of Broome.
Title
Relates to authorizing the Broome county correctional facility to also be used for the detention of persons under arrest being held for arraignment in any court located in the county of Broome.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s8431 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.366 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.366 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S08431 (Same As) 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.505