NY A10492 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s9450
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s9450
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to employer violations of certain provisions allowing for workplace safety committees; allows the commissioner of labor to assess certain civil penalties for such violations.
Title
Relates to employer violations of certain provisions allowing for workplace safety committees; allows the commissioner of labor to assess certain civil penalties for such violations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s9450 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.661 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.661 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-28 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S09450 (Same As) 2022-12-28 - APPROVAL MEMO.91