NY S09450 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-28 - APPROVAL MEMO.91
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-28 - APPROVAL MEMO.91
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to employer violations of certain provisions allowing for workplace safety committees; allows the commissioner of labor to assess certain civil penalties for such violations.
Title
Relates to employer violations of certain provisions allowing for workplace safety committees; allows the commissioner of labor to assess certain civil penalties for such violations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-28 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.91 |
2022-12-28 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.808 |
2022-12-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.661 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a10492 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-31 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1739 |
2022-05-31 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A10492 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - substituted by s9450