NY A10487 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the application of a lien or pledge for the benefit of certain bondholders to amounts withheld from certain taxes, penalties and interest imposed by the city of New York.
Title
Relates to the application of a lien or pledge for the benefit of certain bondholders to amounts withheld from certain taxes, penalties and interest imposed by the city of New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.761 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.761 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |