NY A10453 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - signed chap.178
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes Thomas J. Carinci, Jr. to take the competitive civil service examination and be placed on the eligible civil service list for employment as a full-time police officer for the city of Little Falls; exempts such applicant from the age restriction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes Thomas J. Carinci, Jr. to take the competitive civil service examination and be placed on the eligible civil service list for employment as a full-time police officer for the city of Little Falls; exempts such applicant from the age restriction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-21Senatesigned chap.178
2020-09-16Assemblydelivered to governor
2020-07-22SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-07-22SenatePASSED SENATE
2020-07-22SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2020-07-22Senate3RD READING CAL.901
2020-07-22SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S8333
2020-06-10SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2020-06-10Assemblydelivered to senate
2020-06-10Assemblypassed assembly
2020-06-10Assemblyhome rule request
2020-06-09Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.126
2020-06-09Assemblyrules report cal.126
2020-06-09Assemblyreported
2020-06-09Assemblyreported referred to rules
2020-06-06Assemblyreference changed to ways and means
2020-05-18Assemblyreferred to governmental employees

Same As/Similar To

S08333 (Same As) 2020-07-22 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10453

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback