NY S08333 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - signed chap.178
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - signed chap.178
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Thomas J. Carinci, Jr. to take the competitive civil service examination and be placed on the eligible civil service list for employment as a full-time police officer for the city of Little Falls; exempts such applicant from the age restriction.
Title
Authorizes Thomas J. Carinci, Jr. to take the competitive civil service examination and be placed on the eligible civil service list for employment as a full-time police officer for the city of Little Falls; exempts such applicant from the age restriction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-21 | Senate | signed chap.178 |
2020-09-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.901 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8333 |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-06-10 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-06-10 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-06-10 | Senate | home rule request |
2020-06-09 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.126 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | rules report cal.126 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | reported |
2020-06-09 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-06-06 | Senate | reference changed to ways and means |
2020-05-18 | Senate | referred to governmental employees |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10453 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.901 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10453 (Same As) 2020-09-21 - signed chap.178