NY A10434 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s7906a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s7906a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Chabad of Oceanside, Inc. to receive retroactive real property tax exempt status.
Title
Authorizes the Chabad of Oceanside, Inc. to receive retroactive real property tax exempt status.
Sponsors
Asm. Eric Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s7906a |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.756 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | print number 10434a |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S07906 (Same As) 2022-12-23 - SIGNED CHAP.772