NY S07906 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - SIGNED CHAP.772
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - SIGNED CHAP.772
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Chabad of Oceanside, Inc. to receive retroactive real property tax exempt status.
Title
Authorizes the Chabad of Oceanside, Inc. to receive retroactive real property tax exempt status.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-23 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.772 |
2022-12-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.756 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a10434a |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2022-05-31 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-31 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2022-05-23 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7906A |
2022-05-23 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-23 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2022-05-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.941 |
2022-01-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10434 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - substituted by s7906a